Peoples v. SCDC et al

Plaintiff: Robert Peoples
Defendant: SCDC, Anthony Padula, Clarence Rogers, Matthew Williams, Cheryl Owens, Belinda Davis, Vivian McCall and Ms Driggers
Case Number: 8:2007cv02897
Filed: August 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Dorchester
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 87 Report and Recommendations that defendants' 57 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ms Driggers, SCDC, Vivian McCall, Clarence Rogers, Cheryl Owens, Belinda Davis, Anthony Padula, is Granted and this matter is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 2/13/09. (kmca)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending defendants' 57 First MOTION for Summary Judgment be Granted. Objections to R&R due by 2/9/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/23/09. (kmca)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 59 Report and Recommendations that Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment is denied. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 9/9/08. (mdoe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peoples v. SCDC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Padula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Driggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?