Simons v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Simons
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc and Bank of America Corp
Case Number: 8:2011cv03180
Filed: November 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Newberry
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER AND OPINION granting 132 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as set out; Simons' oral motion for attorney's fees for having to defend against BOA's motion for partial summary judgment is hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/29/2014.(mbro, )
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 OPINION AND ORDER denying 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/1/2013.(mbro)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OPINION AND ORDER denying 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/31/2013.(mbro)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simons v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Simons
Represented By: James Edward Bell, III
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jophlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?