Anderson v. The United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Kristen Miles Anderson
Defendant: United States of America, The, Richard Kerns, Gregory Johnson, Thomas Griffin, Jr, Mark J Sullivan, Janet Napolitano and Others as yet unknown
Case Number: 8:2012cv03203
Filed: November 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Presiding Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, Federal Filers (Bivens)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER RULING ON 157 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court finds the Government's 150 Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment should be GRANTED. In addition, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2676, the remaining claims against Kerns are hereby DISMISSED. The 179 MOTION to Amend the Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/27/16. (kmca)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER: Anderson's objections (ECF No. 137 , 141 ) to the magistrate judge's orders are without merit and the orders (ECF No. 134 , 139 ) are AFFIRMED. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 4/17/2015. (mcot, )
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Extend, ECF No. 110 , is granted in part and denied in part, and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, ECF No. 117 , is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 3/19/2015.(mcot, )
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/12/2014.(mcot, )
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court agrees with the 73 Report's recommended disposition, in part and incorporates those parts herein. Specially, the court decides as follows: 1. Federal Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted as to Counts I and II; 2. Federal Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part as to Count III as discussed above, in particular, the motion is granted as to Anderson's FTCA claims formal icious prosecution, conspiracy, and intentional infliction of emotional distress resulting from the individual Federal Defendants' conduct and denied as to supervisory liability and intentional infliction of emotional distress resulting from Ker ns's conduct; 3. Federal Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted as to Count V; 4. Federal Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted as to Counts VI and VII, however, these counts remain against Kerns; and 5. Federal Defendants' m otion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part as to Count IX the motion is granted as to the individual Federal Defendants, but denied as to the United States. Accordingly, the Federal Defendants' motion for dismiss (ECF No. 52 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/26/2014. (mcot, )
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: No later than April 2, 2013, counsel for the Moving Defendants is to provide a written update to the court via ECF regarding the status of the pending Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 24 , in light of the agreed-to Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 3/25/2013. (mcot, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Miles Anderson
Represented By: Raymond A Mansolillo
Represented By: John Kirkman Moorhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Griffin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Others as yet unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?