Hickerson v. Yamaha Motor Corporation USA
Plaintiff: Deborah Meek Hickerson
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corporation USA
Case Number: 8:2013cv02311
Filed: August 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying 110 Motion to Alter Judgment Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 12/16/2016.(eber)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER and OPINION granting 70 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/15/16.(alew, )
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER AND OPINION denying 66 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/1/16.(jtho, )
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER and OPIONION granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion in Limine Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/29/16.(alew, )
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion in Limine Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/21/2016.(abuc)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER AND OPINION granting 63 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/19/2016.(abuc)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion in Limine as set out. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/19/16.(kmca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickerson v. Yamaha Motor Corporation USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Meek Hickerson
Represented By: Douglas Franklin Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corporation USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?