Ashmore v. Wilson

Plaintiff: Beattie B Ashmore
Defendant: Roswell Wilson
Case Number: 8:2015cv02368
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1367
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER and OPINION denying 44 Motion for Reconsideration re 42 Order on Motion to Certify Questions. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/8/17.(alew, )
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting in part 43 Motion for Reconsideration as set out. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/1/17.(alew, )
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER and OPINION denying 36 Motion to Certify Questions of State Law. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/28/16.(alew, ) Modified on 11/28/2016 to edit text (alew, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashmore v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beattie B Ashmore
Represented By: Lauren S Price
Represented By: Lewis Walter Tollison, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roswell Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?