Ivey v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Shelley Marie Ivey
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2015cv02715
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Lexington
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Presiding Judge: Mary G Lewis
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/31/2016.(abuc)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT / The court has ordered that the Commissioner's decision is reversed and the action is remanded for further administrative action. (abuc)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER adopting 14 Report and Recommendation. It is the judgment of theCourt that this matter is REVERSED AND REMANDED for further administrative proceedings under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/10/2016.(abuc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivey v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Marie Ivey
Represented By: Osborne Eugene Powell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?