Whitner v. Cartledge
Petitioner: Samuel Lamont Whitner
Respondent: Larry Cartledge
Case Number: 8:2016cv01392
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING 29 ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, granting Respondent's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Petitioner's application for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is dismissed with prejudice. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/5/2017. (abuc)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order to Vacate 39 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation to allow Petitioner time to file objections to the Report and Recommendation. Objections must be filed within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order. Further extensions of time in which to file objections will not be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 4/25/2017. (gpre, )
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 15 . Accordingly, theReport and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted and incorporated by reference. Defendants motion for summary judgment is granted, and this matter is dismissed with prejudice. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 3/21/2017. (kric, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitner v. Cartledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Lamont Whitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Cartledge
Represented By: Donald John Zelenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?