McCollum et al v. Bentley et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Brook McCollum and Hannah Whitfield McCollum
Defendant: Steven Paul Bentley, Jacoby Trucking and Delivery LLC, Foundation Xpress LLC and John Does
Case Number: 8:2017cv01244
Filed: May 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re Discovery Issues. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/14/2018. (abuc)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 2/12/2018.(abuc)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Quash; granting 31 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/21/2017.(abuc)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 32 Motion for Confidentiality Order Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/7/2017.(abuc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCollum et al v. Bentley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Brook McCollum
Represented By: Donald L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Whitfield McCollum
Represented By: Donald L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Paul Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacoby Trucking and Delivery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation Xpress LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?