Anderson, County of v. Rite Aid of South Carolina Inc et al
Plaintiff: Anderson, County of
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma LP, Smith Drug Company, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Beth Taylor, Allergan PLC, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Leigh Varnadore, Clinic 2, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, John Doe 2, Allergan Finance LLC, Clinic 4, INSYS Therapeutics Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Spine and Pain Consultants PA, Rite Aid of South Carolina Inc, Clinic 3, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Mackie Walker, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, John Doe 3, Clinic 1, Paul Kitchin, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Actavis LLC, Leavis Sullivan, Actavis Pharma Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Aathirayen Thiyagarajah, Clinic 5, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, John Doe 4 and John Doe 1
Case Number: 8:2018cv01947
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Vacating Conditional Transfer Order and Vacating the September 27, 2018, Hearing Session Order. (alew, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 45 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #44 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Stay to Anderson County Court of Common Pleas, Robert Shirley (alew, )
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court.; granting #8 Motion to Expedite; granting #8 Motion ; denying #14 Motion to Stay; granting #24 Motion to Remand to State Court. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court.; granting #24 Motion to Expedite; granting #24 Motion. The request that this Court sever certain Defendants to provide federal jurisdiction is denied. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/17/18.(alew, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Anderson, County of to #24 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Expedited Ruling and to Reduce Defendants' Time to File a Response re #22 Supplement, #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion for Expedited Ruling and to Reduce Defendants' Time to File a Response MOT, #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion for Expedited Ruling and to Reduce Defendants' Time to File a Response MOTION to Expedite, #26 Response in Opposition to Motion, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SC Supreme Court Order)(White, John) Modified on 8/13/2018 to edit text (alew, ).
August 8, 2018 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Expedited Ruling and to Reduce Defendants' Time to File a Response re #22 Supplement, #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion for Expedited Ruling and to Reduce Defendants' Time to File a Response MOT Response filed by Anderson, County of. (White, John)
August 6, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Expedited Ruling and to Reduce Defendants' Time to File a Response re #22 Supplement, #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion for Expedited Ruling and to Reduce Defendants' Time to File a Response MOT Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion to Remand and Motion for Expedited Ruling Response filed by McKesson Corporation.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/13/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CTO-46, #2 Exhibit Statement of Interest of U.S., #3 Exhibit April 2018 Transfer Order, #4 Exhibit August 2018 Transfer Order)(Lay, John)
August 3, 2018 Filing 38 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has filed #24 Supplemental Emergency Motion to Remand to State Court and Motion for Expedited Ruling and to Reduce Defendants' Time to File a Response. The time to respond to the supplemental motion to remand is shortened to 8/6/2018. The reply time to the response is shortened to 8/8/18. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/3/18. (kmca)
August 3, 2018 Filing 36 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, #16 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, and #34 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. All Defendants shall have through, and including, 30 days after any ruling by this Court on Plaintiff's motions to remand to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/3/18. (kmca)
August 2, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 Joint MOTION to Stay Response filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, INSYS Therapeutics Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2018.08.01 42 MDL 2804 Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2007.07.18 #14 Order (SC v Eli Lilly), #3 Exhibit 3 - 2018.05.21 66 Order (Gville v RiteAid, et al), #4 Exhibit 4 - 2017.11.13 42 Order Granting Motion to Stay (Dayton v Purdue), #5 Exhibit 5 - 2017.10.27 66 Order (Lorain v Purdue), #6 Exhibit 6 - 2018.06.06 1750 Transfer Order (Natl RX Opiate Lit), #7 Exhibit 7 - 2018.04.05 1134 Order Transferring 9 Actions (Natl RX Opiate Lit), #8 Exhibit 8 - 2018.02.01 656 Transfer Order (Natl RX Opiate Lit))(Fornadel, Joseph) (Additional attachment added on 8/3/2018, as requested by and provided by filing user: #9 Exhibit 9 - 2018.07.16 23 Order granting Motions to Stay) (kmca).
August 2, 2018 Filing 34 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Paul Kitchin, Leavis Sullivan, Beth Taylor, Leigh Varnadore. Response to Motion due by 8/16/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McMillan, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2018 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion for Expedited Ruling and to Reduce Defendants' Time to File a Response MOTION to Expedite Response filed by Anderson, County of. (White, John) (Main Document 33 replaced on 8/2/2018: to replace with corrected document (footnotes) as provided by filing user) (kmca).
July 31, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion for Expedited Ruling and to Reduce Defendants' Time to File a Response MOTION to Expedite Response filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/7/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2018.07.25 32 Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2018.07.19 2060 CTO-46 (Natl Rx Opiate Lit), #3 Exhibit 3 - 2018.06.18 Beaufort Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2017.12.05 328 Transfer Order (Natl Rx Opate Lit))(Fornadel, Joseph)
July 31, 2018 Filing 30 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc.(Livoti, Anthony)
July 30, 2018 Filing 28 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rite Aid of South Carolina Inc.(Dorn, Elbert)
July 30, 2018 Filing 27 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc.(Ashmore, Beattie)
July 26, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Joint MOTION to Stay Response filed by Anderson, County of.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/2/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Spartanburg County Remand Order, #2 Exhibit B - Texas MDL Panel Order)(White, John)
July 26, 2018 Filing 25 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cardinal Health Inc.(Casey, Alice)
July 25, 2018 Filing 24 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION to Expedite ( Response to Motion due by 8/8/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ), MOTION for Expedited Ruling and to Reduce Defendants' Time to File a Response re #22 Supplement, #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite by Anderson, County of. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - S.D.W. Va. Remand Order)No proposed order.(White, John) Modified on 7/26/2018 to edit text (alew, ).
July 24, 2018 Filing 23 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 19 Reason: attorney refiled to make correction. Corrected Filing Document Number #22 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 7/23/18 (alew, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT by McKesson Corporation to #1 Notice of Removal,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings (Part 1), #2 Exhibit State Court Filings (Part 2), #3 Exhibit State Court Filings (Part 3))(Crapps, Jordan) Modified on 7/24/2018 to correct filing date (alew, ).
July 23, 2018 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Crapps, Jordan) (Main Document 20 replaced on 7/24/2018) (alew, ). Modified on 7/24/2018 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user(alew, ).
July 23, 2018 Filing 18 Case Reassigned to Judge Bruce Howe Hendricks. Judge Unassigned - MDL no longer assigned to the case. (suro)
July 20, 2018 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, INSYS Therapeutics Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/3/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Kitts, Amanda)
July 20, 2018 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by McKesson Corporation. Response to Motion due by 8/3/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Lay, John) Modified on 7/23/2018 to edit motion relief (alew, ).
July 19, 2018 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, INSYS Therapeutics Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/2/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opp to Motion to Remand 42 , Order 66 , #2 Exhibit 2 - 2017.12.05 328 Transfer Order (Natl Rx Opiate Lit), #3 Exhibit 3 - 2018.06.25 1855 CTO-40 (Natl Rx Opiate Lit), #4 Exhibit 4 - 2018.07.19 2060 CTO-46 (Natl Rx Opiate Lit), #5 Exhibit 5 - 2018.07.16 23 Order granting Motions to Stay, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2017.11.15 29 Order granting Dfs' Motion to Stay, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2017.10.25 57 Order (Lewis v Purdue, et al), #8 Exhibit 8 - 2017.10.27 [66-1] Order (Lorain v Purdue, et al), #9 Exhibit 9 - 2017.11.03 19 Order (Anderson Co v Amerisourcebergen), #10 Exhibit 10 - 2017.10.27 21 Order (Bell Co v Amerisourcebergen), #11 Exhibit 11 - 2017.11.02 #20 Order (Henry Co v Amerisourcebergen), #12 Exhibit 12 - 2018.07.16 #25 Order granting Motions to Stay)No proposed order.(Fornadel, Joseph)
July 19, 2018 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Young, Brent)
July 19, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin Brown Parkinson, Jr on behalf of Spine and Pain Consultants PA, Aathirayen Thiyagarajah (Parkinson, Edwin)
July 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Anderson County. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Acknowledgment of Filing of Removal)(Fornadel, Joseph)
July 17, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Burl Franklin Williams on behalf of Rite Aid of South Carolina Inc (Williams, Burl)
July 17, 2018 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Anderson, County of.(White, John)
July 17, 2018 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion for Expedited Ruling and to Reduce Defendants' Time to File a Response by Anderson, County of. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Greenville County Remand Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Transcript of Tel. Proceedings, #4 Exhibit 3 - Order Regarding Remands, #5 Exhibit 4 - Case Management Order One, #6 Exhibit 5- Order Regarding Remand Briefing)No proposed order.(White, John). Added MOTION to Expedite, MOTION to Reduce Defendants' Time to File a Response on 7/18/2018; modified to add motion reliefs (alew, ). Modified on 8/1/2018: see #24 Supplemental Motion (kmca).
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.(alew, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-04-01108. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7889475), filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2017.12.05 328 Transfer Order (Natl Rx Opate Lit), #2 Exhibit 2-2018.06.06 S&C (Anderson v RiteAid, et al), #3 Exhibit 3-State Court docs, # 5 LR 26.01 Answers)(alew, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/17/2018) (alew, ). Modified on 7/17/2018 to replace with corrected document per attorney (alew, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson, County of v. Rite Aid of South Carolina Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Amanda S Kitts
Represented By: Joseph Edward Fornadel, III
Represented By: David Eidson Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: John T Lay
Represented By: Jordan M Crapps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Vordman Carlisle Traywick
Represented By: Rebecca Laffitte
Represented By: Monteith Powell Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: Megan Christine White
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Amanda S Kitts
Represented By: Joseph Edward Fornadel, III
Represented By: David Eidson Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: William Alexander Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Taylor
Represented By: Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Thad H Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Anthony W Livoti
Represented By: E Raymond Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Brent Brigham Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Varnadore
Represented By: Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinic 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Anthony W Livoti
Represented By: E Raymond Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Amanda S Kitts
Represented By: Joseph Edward Fornadel, III
Represented By: David Eidson Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Thad H Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinic 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSYS Therapeutics Inc
Represented By: George G Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Vordman Carlisle Traywick
Represented By: Rebecca Laffitte
Represented By: Monteith Powell Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spine and Pain Consultants PA
Represented By: Edwin Brown Parkinson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of South Carolina Inc
Represented By: Burl Franklin Williams
Represented By: Elbert Stockman Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinic 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Beattie B Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackie Walker
Represented By: Celeste Tiller Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Anthony W Livoti
Represented By: E Raymond Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Amanda S Kitts
Represented By: Joseph Edward Fornadel, III
Represented By: David Eidson Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinic 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Kitchin
Represented By: Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Brent Brigham Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: George L Inabinet, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: William Alexander Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Alice W Parham Casey
Represented By: Matthew T Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Anthony W Livoti
Represented By: E Raymond Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leavis Sullivan
Represented By: Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Anthony W Livoti
Represented By: E Raymond Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By: Beattie B Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aathirayen Thiyagarajah
Represented By: Edwin Brown Parkinson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinic 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The
Represented By: Vordman Carlisle Traywick
Represented By: Rebecca Laffitte
Represented By: Monteith Powell Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anderson, County of
Represented By: Marghretta Hagood Shisko
Represented By: Matthew E Yelverton
Represented By: John Belton White, Jr
Represented By: Gregory Lee Cole, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?