Schaefer
In Re: Mark Schaefer
Claimant: Glenn Parkes Warnock and GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2018cv01950
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: A Marvin Quattlebaum
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46:30511
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER to 8:18-cv-1950-HMH - PLEASE NOTE FOR YOUR RECORDS AND FUTURE FILINGS. (sfla)
September 11, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by John Townsend Cooper for 10/17/2018 - 10/18/2018; 11/1/2018 - 11/9/2018; 11/19/2018 - 11/21/2018 (Cooper, John)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr. Judge Honorable A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by S Scott Bluestein on behalf of GEICO Marine Insurance Company (Bluestein, S)
August 19, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION re #1 Complaint for Order Approving Stipulation for Value and for Costs, Directing Issuance of Notice and Retraining Suits Response filed by Mark Schaefer. (Collins, David)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION re #1 Complaint for Order Approving Stipulation for Value and for Costs, Directing Issuance of Notice and Retraining Suits Response filed by Glenn Parkes Warnock.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/22/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Pages 1 and 2 of SCDNR Boating Accident Report)(Cooper, John)
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 Supplemental Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mark Schaefer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SCDNR supplement to Boating Accident Report (list of potential claimants))(Collins, David)
August 1, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Order Approving Stipulation for Value and for Costs, Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Suits re #1 Complaint by Mark Schaefer. Response to Motion due by 8/15/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Collins, David) Modified on 8/1/2018: to correct typo (kmca).
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Townsend Cooper on behalf of Glenn Parkes Warnock (Cooper, John)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Value and for Costs by Mark Schaefer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Undertaking, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Value)(Collins, David)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mark Schaefer.(alew, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7890350.), filed by Mark Schaefer. Service due by 10/15/2018(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Mark Schaefer
Represented By: David Michael Collins
Represented By: Thomas Michael Cull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Glenn Parkes Warnock
Represented By: John Townsend Cooper
Represented By: John Hughes Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: S Scott Bluestein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?