Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Baggott et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Thomas E Baggott and T B Private Club Inc
Case Number: 8:2018cv02197
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Saluda
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0553
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas E Baggott, T B Private Club Inc.(Spreeuwers, Steven)
September 28, 2018 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Thomas E Baggott, T B Private Club Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/12/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Spreeuwers, Steven)
September 28, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Richard Spreeuwers on behalf of Thomas E Baggott, T B Private Club Inc (Spreeuwers, Steven)
August 24, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service as to Thomas E. Baggott, #2 Affidavit of Service as to T B Private Club, Inc. d/b/a TB's Shack on the Water)(Hale, Eric)
August 10, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Thomas E Baggott, T B Private Club Inc. (abuc)
August 9, 2018 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(abuc)
August 9, 2018 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(abuc)
August 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas E Baggott, T B Private Club Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7936005.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Service due by 11/7/2018(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Baggott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Eric C Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E Baggott
Represented By: Wesley Dickinson Peel
Represented By: Steven Richard Spreeuwers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T B Private Club Inc
Represented By: Wesley Dickinson Peel
Represented By: Steven Richard Spreeuwers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?