Little v. Wilkie et al
Plaintiff: Bessie L Little
Defendant: Mary Ann Wentzel, Mae Hazel, Robert Wilkie and James M Byrne
Case Number: 8:2018cv02275
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Greenwood
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to James M Byrne. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 12/6/2018 (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General)(kric, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to James M Byrne, Mae Hazel, Mary Ann Wentzel, Robert Wilkie. (kric, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Order Service - Non-Inmate placed in U.S. Mail to Bessie L. Little (kric, )
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/7/2018. (kric, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #9 Proper Form Order, Summons form, USM-285 forms (4), placed in U.S. Mail to Bessie Little (gpre, )
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPER FORM ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Case to be brought into proper form by 9/17/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/27/2018. (gpre, )
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/27/2018.(gpre, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bessie L Little.(kmca)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Bessie L Little. Response to Motion due by 8/29/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(kmca)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James M Byrne, Mae Hazel, Mary Ann Wentzel, Robert Wilkie, filed by Bessie L Little. Service due by 11/13/2018.(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. Wilkie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie L Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Wentzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mae Hazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?