NBSC v. Clary et al

Plaintiff: NBSC
Defendant: Horace E Walpole, Jr and Marty K Clary
Case Number: 8:2018cv02991
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by NBSC. (Poston, Brandon)
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Horace E. Walpole, Jr. answer due 1/10/2019. Entered by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on December 20, 2018. (bedw)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant Horace E. Walpole Jr. to file answer by NBSC. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Poston, Brandon)
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Marty K Clary (sfla)
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT byNBSC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default Against Marty K. Clary)(Poston, Brandon)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Horace E Walpole, Jr answer due 12/20/2018. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 12/3/18.(sfla)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant Horace E. Walpole, Jr. to file answer by NBSC. Response to Motion due by 12/14/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Poston, Brandon) Modified on 12/3/2018 TO CORRECT EVENT RELIEF(sfla).
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 6 and 7 - Reason: attorney refiled using correct event; Corrected Filing Document Number #9 , #8 (sfla)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NBSC. Affidavit of Service Horace E Walpole, Jr served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - Walpole)(Poston, Brandon) Modified on 11/19/2018 to modify text to remove DUPLICATE WORD. (sfla).
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NBSC. Affidavit of Service Marty K Clary served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - Clary)(Poston, Brandon) Modified on 11/19/2018 to modify text to remove DUPLICATE WORD. (sfla).
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Marty K Clary, Horace E Walpole, Jr. (sfla)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NBSC identifying Corporate Parent Synovus Financial Corp for NBSC. (sfla)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by NBSC.(sfla)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marty K Clary, Horace E Walpole, Jr ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8091511) filed by NBSC. Service due by 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B: Clary Guaranty, #3 Exhibit C: Walpole Guaranty, #4 Exhibit D: Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit E: Verification of Debt) (sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NBSC v. Clary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horace E Walpole, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty K Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBSC
Represented By: Graham Smith Mitchell
Represented By: Brandon Keith Poston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?