Glover v. Kraft Heinz Foods Co

Plaintiff: Dr David Glover
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Foods Co
Case Number: 8:2019cv00550
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 21:399
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Thomas R Chiavetta and Vanessa Rose Vogler added for Defendant. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 4/5/19.(kmca)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vanessa Rose Vogler ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8368762) by Kraft Heinz Foods Co. Response to Motion due by 4/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Walsh, Elaine)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas R. Chiavetta ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8368733) by Kraft Heinz Foods Co. Response to Motion due by 4/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Walsh, Elaine)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Elaine Rogers Walsh for December 16, 2019 through January 2, 2020 (Walsh, Elaine)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 9/16/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/26/19. (kmca)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/15/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/29/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 4/29/2019, ADR/Mediation Statement due by 4/29/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/10/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/10/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/9/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/9/2019, Discovery due by 9/9/2019, Motions due by 9/23/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/1/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 12/2/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/26/19. (kmca)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kraft Heinz Foods Co.(Walsh, Elaine)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kraft Heinz Foods Co.(Walsh, Elaine) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/26/2019: to replace with corrected document (signature block) as provided by filing user) (kmca).
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kraft Heinz Foods Co. (kmca)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Glover.(kmca)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kraft Heinz Foods Co (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8286103), filed by David Glover. Service due by 5/23/2019.(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Kraft Heinz Foods Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr David Glover
Represented By: Herbert W Louthian, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Foods Co
Represented By: Vanessa Rose Vogler
Represented By: Thomas R Chiavetta
Represented By: Elaine Rogers Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?