Cain v. Receivables Management Corporation

Plaintiff: Marcie Cain
Defendant: Receivables Management Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01334
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Marcie Cain (Bland, Chauntel) Modified on 6/19/2019 to edit text (alew, ).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 5/17/19. (alew, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Marcie Cain (Bland, Chauntel)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Receivables Management Corporation. (alew, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Marcie Cain.(alew, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Receivables Management Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8430935.), filed by Marcie Cain. Service due by 8/5/2019(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cain v. Receivables Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receivables Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcie Cain
Represented By: Chauntel Demetrius Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?