Weddle v. Everest Reinsurance Company

Plaintiff: Kevin Weddle
Defendant: Everest Reinsurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv01395
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jessica A. Swauger ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8534301) by Everest Reinsurance Company. Response to Motion due by 7/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dalzell, Elizabeth)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 12/4/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/13/19. (kmca)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/3/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/17/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/17/2019, ADR/Mediation Statement due by 7/17/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/27/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/26/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/28/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/28/2019, Discovery due by 11/27/2019, Motions due by 12/11/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/6/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 4/6/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/13/19. (kmca)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Everest Reinsurance Company.(Dalzell, Elizabeth)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John B Mumford Jr added for Defendant. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/5/19.(kmca)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John B. Mumford, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8484039) by Everest Reinsurance Company. Response to Motion due by 6/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dalzell, Elizabeth)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Everest Reinsurance Company answer and/or Responsive Pleadings due 6/10/2019. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 5/15/19.(kmca)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Responsive Pleadings by Everest Reinsurance Company. Response to Motion due by 5/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Fittipaldi, Susan) Modified on 5/15/2019: to correct relief requested (kmca).
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kevin Weddle.(Alderson, Ryan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Everest Reinsurance Company.(kmca)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-04-00600. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8440563), filed by Everest Reinsurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents with Amended Summons and Amended Complaint)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weddle v. Everest Reinsurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Reinsurance Company
Represented By: Susan M Fittipaldi
Represented By: John Becker Mumford, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth M Dalzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Weddle
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Alderson
Represented By: Nathaniel W Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?