Nelson v. Borg Warner PDS USA Inc
Plaintiff: Connie Nelson
Defendant: Borg Warner PDS USA Inc
Case Number: 8:2019cv01558
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/30/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/30/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/29/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/29/2019, Discovery due by 1/31/2020, Motions due by 4/1/2020, Mediation Due by 3/2/2020, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/11/2019. (kric, ) Modified on 7/11/2019 to edit text (kric, ).
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Borg Warner PDS USA Inc(Asper, Lucas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Borg Warner PDS USA Inc.(Asper, Lucas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Borg Warner PDS USA Inc, Connie Nelson.(Asper, Lucas) Modified on 7/11/2019: to add joint filer as listed (kmca).
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Borg Warner PDS USA Inc, Connie Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order First Amended Scheduling Order)(Asper, Lucas) Modified on 7/11/2019: to add joint filer as listed (kmca).
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Connie Nelson(Arnold, Brian)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Connie Nelson.(Arnold, Brian)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/26/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/10/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/10/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/31/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/30/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/30/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/30/2019, Discovery due by 12/2/2019, Motions due by 1/31/2020, Mediation Due by 1/2/2020. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 9 of this Order,unless otherwise ordered by the Court Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 6/5/2019. (gpre, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Borg Warner PDS USA Inc.(Asper, Lucas)
June 2, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Connie Nelson.(Arnold, Brian)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: Plaintiff's answers to local rule 26.01 interrogatories are due no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the notice of removal. (gpre, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Borg Warner PDS USA Inc.(gpre, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-37-00235. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8472041), filed by Borg Warner PDS USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice of Fiing)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Borg Warner PDS USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Nelson
Represented By: Brian E Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg Warner PDS USA Inc
Represented By: Lucas James Asper
Represented By: Sara E McCreary
Represented By: Sara E Olschewske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?