Goodine v. Robert Bosch LLC
Plaintiff: Pamela Goodine
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01701
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert Bosch LLC, filed by Pamela Goodine. Service due by 10/21/2019 (Murphy, Brian)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Goodine. Robert Bosch LLC served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents PS Form 3811 - Robert Bosch, LLC)(Murphy, Brian)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert Bosch LLC. (abuc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pamela Goodine.(abuc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Bosch LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8503878.), filed by Pamela Goodine. Service due by 9/11/2019(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodine v. Robert Bosch LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Goodine
Represented By: Brian P Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?