Schwerzler v. Commissioner Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Tammy Wynelle Schwerzler
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Record
Case Number: 8:2019cv01737
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tammy Wynelle Schwerzler. Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 6/21/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service green cards)(McDaniel, Christi)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 6/19/19.(jsmi, )
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/18/19. (jsmi, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED 4 Proposed Document to Judge Cain (jsmi, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jsmi, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Tammy Wynelle Schwerzler. Response to Motion due by 7/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(jsmi, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Tammy Wynelle Schwerzler. Service due by 9/16/2019(jsmi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwerzler v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Wynelle Schwerzler
Represented By: Christi Barfield McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?