Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Corbett McGee's Irish Pub Inc et al
Plaintiff: Hollis Music Inc, Terry Stafford Music Co, Concord Music Group Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Broadcast Music Inc and Cotillion Music Inc
Defendant: Corbett McGee's Irish Pub Inc, Dixie M Benca, McGee and John P Benca
Case Number: 8:2019cv01782
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cotillion Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Hollis Music Inc, Terry Stafford Music Co. John P Benca served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ellis, Bernie)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cotillion Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Hollis Music Inc, Terry Stafford Music Co. Dixie M Benca served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ellis, Bernie)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cotillion Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Hollis Music Inc, Terry Stafford Music Co. Corbett McGee's Irish Pub Inc served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ellis, Bernie)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #6 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright to Copyright Office, (508filings@loc.gov). (kmca)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. (kmca)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dixie M Benca, John P Benca, Corbett McGee's Irish Pub Inc. (kmca)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Broadcast Music Inc.(kmca)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Broadcast Music Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Hollis Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Terry Stafford Music Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corporate Information)(kmca)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dixie M Benca, John P Benca, Corbett McGee's Irish Pub Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8519176), filed by Cotillion Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Hollis Music Inc, Terry Stafford Music Co. Service due by 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule to Complaint)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Corbett McGee's Irish Pub Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corbett McGee's Irish Pub Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie M Benca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Benca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollis Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Stafford Music Co
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?