Vinson v. SavaSeniorCare LLC et al

Plaintiff: Keith Vinson
Defendant: SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC, SavaSeniorCare LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC and SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01785
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Keith Vinson.Associated Cases: 8:19-cv-01775-DCC, 8:19-cv-01785-DCC(Harbin, Anthony)
August 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Spragins Burnett on behalf of Keith Vinson (Burnett, Jennifer)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 CONSOLIDATION NOTICE Associated Cases: 8:19-cv-01775-DCC, 8:19-cv-01785-DCC(abuc)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/13/2019.(abuc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Keith Vinson. Response to Motion due by 8/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Harbin, Anthony)
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY: The Court held a telephonic Rule 16 conference with the parties. The parties are directed to submit responses to Local Rule 26.03 interrogatories within 14 days. Additionally, the parties are directed to confer about consolidating case number 8:19-cv-1775 and case number 8:19-cv-1785. If the parties are able to reach an agreement about consolidation, they are directed to submit a joint motion to consolidate and proposed consent order. Proceedings held before Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr: Pretrial Conference held on 8/6/2019. (abuc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 7/30/2019 11:00 AM cancelled and rescheduled to: Pretrial Telephone Conference set for 8/6/2019 11:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. (abuc)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 7/30/2019 11:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/1/2019. (abuc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/22/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/16/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/9/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/8/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/2/2019, Discovery due by 12/30/2019, Motion in Limine due by 2/26/2020, Motions due by 1/13/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/6/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 3/17/2020, Mediation Due by 1/27/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/1/2019. (abuc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC.(Davis, Donald)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC.(Davis, Donald)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by SSC Equity Holdings LLC.(Davis, Donald)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by SavaSeniorCare LLC.(Davis, Donald)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC.(Davis, Donald)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Keith Vinson.(Harbin, Anthony)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SavaSeniorCare LLC.(abuc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC.(abuc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC.(abuc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SSC Equity Holdings LLC.(abuc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC.(abuc) Modified to correct date filed on 6/24/2019 (abuc).
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-37-002191. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8519451), filed by SavaSeniorCare LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Receipt of Notice of Removal, #3 Consent to Removal by SavaSeniorCare, LLC, #4 Consent to Removal by SavaSeniorCare, Administrative Services LLC, #5 Consent to Removal by SSC Equity Holdings, LLC, #6 Consent to Removal by SavaSeniorCare Consulting, LLC)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vinson v. SavaSeniorCare LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC
Represented By: Perry McPherson Buckner, IV
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Hunter Copeland Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare LLC
Represented By: Perry McPherson Buckner, IV
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Hunter Copeland Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Equity Holdings LLC
Represented By: Perry McPherson Buckner, IV
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Hunter Copeland Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC
Represented By: Perry McPherson Buckner, IV
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Hunter Copeland Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC
Represented By: Perry McPherson Buckner, IV
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Hunter Copeland Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Vinson
Represented By: Anthony Lee Harbin
Represented By: Jennifer Spragins Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?