Dillard v. AnMed Health
Plaintiff: Barbara Dillard
Defendant: AnMed Health
Case Number: 8:2019cv01920
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 15 Reason: Clerk error. Filed in wrong case number. (gpre, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/11/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/10/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/13/2020, Discovery due by 3/13/2020, Motions due by 5/12/2020, Mediation Due by 4/27/2020. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 7 of this Order unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/22/2019. (gpre, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by AnMed Health.(gpre, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by AnMed Health, Barbara Dillard.(Cluverius, Jennifer) Modified on 8/22/2019 to add joint filer listed on document (gpre, ).
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by AnMed Healt, Barbara Dillard.(Cluverius, Jennifer) Modified on 8/22/2019 to add joint filer listed on document; proposed order deleted; LR26.03 Answers deleted and filed separately by clerk as #16 (gpre, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Barbara Dillard.(Porter, James)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/7/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/21/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/21/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/11/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/11/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/12/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/12/2019, Discovery due by 1/13/2020, Motions due by 3/13/2020, Mediation Due by 2/12/2020. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following theissuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 9 of this Order,unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/17/2019. (gpre, ) . (Document with corrected forms replaced on 7/18/2019 by clerk) (gpre, ).
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by AnMed Health.(Cluverius, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Barbara Dillard.(Porter, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: Plaintiff's answers to local rule 26.01 interrogatories are due no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the notice of removal. (gpre, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by AnMed Health.(gpre, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pickens County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-39-00674. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8542889), filed by AnMed Health. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillard v. AnMed Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AnMed Health
Represented By: Elizabeth Ashley Robertson Parr
Represented By: Jennifer S Cluverius
Represented By: Andrew Addison Mathias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Dillard
Represented By: Kyle Jason White
Represented By: James Paul Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?