Whitaker v. Greenwood County School District 52 et al

Plaintiff: Mamie Whitaker
Defendant: Rex Ward, David Schoolfield, Kaycee Bradley and Greenwood County School District 52
Case Number: 8:2019cv01930
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Mamie Whitaker.(Bowen, Elizabeth)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 Defendants' Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Kaycee Bradley, Greenwood County School District 52, David Schoolfield, Rex Ward.(Sherard, Joseph)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Kaycee Bradley, Greenwood County School District 52, David Schoolfield, Rex Ward.(Sherard, Joseph)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Kaycee Bradley, Greenwood County School District 52, David Schoolfield, Rex Ward.(Sherard, Joseph)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Mamie Whitaker.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/5/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Bowen, Elizabeth)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kaycee Bradley, Greenwood County School District 52, David Schoolfield, Rex Ward. Response to Motion due by 7/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Sherard, Joseph)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants' Partial ANSWER to Complaint by Kaycee Bradley, Greenwood County School District 52, David Schoolfield, Rex Ward.(Sherard, Joseph)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/31/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/14/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/14/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/4/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/4/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/4/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/4/2019, Discovery due by 1/3/2020, Mediation Due by 2/3/2020, Motions due by 3/3/2020. **This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 9 of this Order, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/10/19. (kmca) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/11/2019: to remove duplicate initials from case number) (kmca).
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mamie Whitaker.(Bowen, Elizabeth)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: Plaintiff's answers to local rule 26.01 interrogatories are due no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the notice of removal. (gpre, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kaycee Bradley, Greenwood County School District 52, David Schoolfield, Rex Ward.(gpre, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenwood County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-24-00616. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8543848), filed by Greenwood County School District 52, Rex Ward, David Schoolfield, Kaycee Bradley. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice to State Court, #3 Notice to Plaintiff)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitaker v. Greenwood County School District 52 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Ward
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Sherard
Represented By: Ashley Cole Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schoolfield
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Sherard
Represented By: Ashley Cole Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaycee Bradley
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Sherard
Represented By: Ashley Cole Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood County School District 52
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Sherard
Represented By: Ashley Cole Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mamie Whitaker
Represented By: James Lewis Cromer
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?