Frederick v. Samsung Electronics Home Appliances America LLC
Plaintiff: Bridgette Frederick
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Home Appliances America LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01958
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The parties' Consent Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Final and Binding Arbitration, ECF No. #6 , is granted and this matter is hereby stayed pending the outcome of the arbitration. The parties are to submit a joint status report by January 2, 2020, and every six months thereafter until arbitration is completed. Further, the parties are to advise the court within 30 days of the close of arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/22/2019.(prou, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint Pending Arbitration by Samsung Electronics Home Appliances America LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mediation and Arbitration Agreement)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Henthorne, D)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Bridgette Frederick. Samsung Electronics Home Appliances America LLC served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Acceptance of Service)(Lampkin, Harriet). Modified on 8/13/2019 to correct sequence of documents (prou, ).
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics Home Appliances America LLC. (prou, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Bridgette Frederick.(prou, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics Home Appliances America LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8553173.), filed by Bridgette Frederick. Service due by 10/10/2019.(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frederick v. Samsung Electronics Home Appliances America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Home Appliances America LLC
Represented By: D Michael Henthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Frederick
Represented By: Harriet Huell Lampkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?