Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Figaro LLC et al
Plaintiff: ARC Conrad Music LLC, Crompton Songs, Gibb Brothers Music, Unichappell Music Inc, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc and Cotillion Music Inc
Defendant: Figaro LLC and Robert Shirey
Case Number: 8:2019cv02022
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ARC Conrad Music LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Crompton Songs, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc, Gibb Brothers Music, Unichappell Music Inc (Ellis, Bernie)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER directing Plaintiffs' counsel to file a report with respect to the status of this case by September 20, 2019. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/16/2019. (abuc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gibb Brothers Music, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc, Unichappell Music Inc, ARC Conrad Music LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Crompton Songs, Cotillion Music Inc. Figaro LLC served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ellis, Bernie)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Figaro LLC, Robert Shirey. (alew, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Broadcast Music Inc.(alew, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ARC Conrad Music LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Crompton Songs, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc, Gibb Brothers Music, Unichappell Music Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule 7.1 to 26.01 Interrogatories)(alew, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8565829.), filed by Gibb Brothers Music, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc, Unichappell Music Inc, ARC Conrad Music LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Crompton Songs, Cotillion Music Inc. Service due by 10/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Songs to Complaint)(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Figaro LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARC Conrad Music LLC
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crompton Songs
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibb Brothers Music
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fourteenth Hour Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Figaro LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Shirey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?