Key v. Tate & Kirlin Associates Inc et al
Plaintiff: Renada S Key
Defendant: John Does 1-25, LVNV Funding LLC and Tate & Kirlin Associates Inc
Case Number: 8:2019cv02151
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 3/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/25/19. (alew, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/16/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/30/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/30/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/20/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/20/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/21/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/21/2020, Discovery due by 3/23/2020, Motions due by 4/22/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 7/21/2020, Mediation Due by 3/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/25/19. (alew, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by LVNV Funding LLC.(Echols, Chad)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Tate & Kirlin Associates Inc.(Echols, Chad)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tate & Kirlin Associates Inc.(Echols, Chad)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tate & Kirlin Associates Inc.(Echols, Chad)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by LVNV Funding LLC.(Echols, Chad)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by LVNV Funding LLC.(Echols, Chad)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER LVNV Funding LLC answer due 9/24/2019; Tate & Kirlin Associates Inc answer due 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent for Extension)(Echols, Chad)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LVNV Funding LLC, Tate & Kirlin Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons LVNV Funding, LLC)(alew, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Renada S Key.(alew, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-25, LVNV Funding LLC, Tate & Kirlin Associates Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8589963.), filed by Renada S Key. Service due by 10/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Satisfaction Offer)(alew, ) Modified on 8/1/2019 to edit text (alew, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Key v. Tate & Kirlin Associates Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Grassi, Jr
Represented By: Chad Vinson Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate & Kirlin Associates Inc
Represented By: David Anthony Grassi, Jr
Represented By: Chad Vinson Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renada S Key
Represented By: Kenneth Edward Norsworthy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?