Moody v. AnMed Health
Plaintiff: Felice Moody
Defendant: AnMed Health
Case Number: 8:2019cv02157
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by AnMed Health.(Cluverius, Jennifer)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by AnMed Health.(Cluverius, Jennifer)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by AnMed Health.(Cluverius, Jennifer)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Felice Moody.(Porter, James)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/16/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/30/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/30/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/12/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/13/2020, Discovery due by 2/12/2019, Motions due by 2/26/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/6/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 5/6/2020, Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/27/2019. (kric, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by AnMed Health.(Cluverius, Jennifer)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AnMed Health.(Cluverius, Jennifer)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Felice Moody. AnMed Health served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Porter, James)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AnMed Health. (abuc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Felice Moody.(abuc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AnMed Health (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8592195.), filed by Felice Moody. Service due by 10/31/2019(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moody v. AnMed Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felice Moody
Represented By: Samantha Elenor Albrecht
Represented By: James Paul Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AnMed Health
Represented By: Elizabeth Ashley Robertson Parr
Represented By: Jennifer S Cluverius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?