Thomas v. Bailey et al
Plaintiff: Michael Ira Thomas
Defendant: Assoc Warden Bailey, Officer Butcher, Officer Cummings and Dr Alden
Case Number: 8:2019cv02262
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED TO NEW LOCATION #13 Order 1983, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Michael Ira Thomas 369639 W2-476 Manning Correctional Institution 502 Beckman Drive Columbia, SC 29203 (gpre, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Ira Thomas. Address updated. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gpre, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Dr Alden, Assoc Warden Bailey, Officer Butcher, Officer Cummings. Service due by 12/9/2019 (gpre, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Order 1983, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Michael Ira Thomas 369639 GA-9 Ridgeland Correctional Institution 5 Correctional Road Ridgeland, SC 29936 (gpre, )
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER authorizing service of process. Apprising the defendants of deadline for filing dispositive motions and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/9/2019. (gpre, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Proper Form Order, Summons form, USM-285 forms (4), 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Michael Ira Thomas 369639 GA-9 Ridgeland Correctional Institution 5 Correctional Road Ridgeland, SC 29936 (gpre, )
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPER FORM ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Case to be brought into proper form by 9/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/19/2019. (gpre, )
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/19/2019.(gpre, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Beaufort. (gpre, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Ira Thomas. Response to Motion due by 8/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Michael Ira Thomas. Response to Motion due by 8/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dr Alden, Assoc Warden Bailey, Officer Butcher, Officer Cummings, filed by Michael Ira Thomas. Service due by 11/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 IVB, #2 IVD, #3 IVD (2), #4 Envelope)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Bailey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assoc Warden Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Alden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ira Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?