Lake Russell Holdings LLC et al v. Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lake Russell Holdings LLC and Lake Russell Lending LLC
Defendant: Ryan R Faulkenberry, Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc and William R Faulkenberry
Case Number: 8:2019cv02410
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 20 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/23/19. (sfla)
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Lake Russell Holdings LLC, Lake Russell Lending LLC.(Poston, Brandon)
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Lake Russell Holdings LLC, Lake Russell Lending LLC.(Poston, Brandon)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 Rule 26(f) Report by Lake Russell Holdings LLC, Lake Russell Lending LLC.(Poston, Brandon)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Waiver of Jury Trial by Lake Russell Holdings LLC, Lake Russell Lending LLC. (Poston, Brandon)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/14/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/28/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/28/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/5/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/6/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/7/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/7/2020, Discovery due by 5/7/2020, Motion in Limine due by 7/21/2020, Motions due by 5/21/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/2/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 7/28/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/4/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/23/19. (sfla)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc, Ryan R Faulkenberry, William R Faulkenberry.(Raffini, Joshua)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc, Ryan R Faulkenberry, William R Faulkenberry.(Raffini, Joshua)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lake Russell Lending LLC, Lake Russell Holdings LLC. William R Faulkenberry served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service William Faulkenberry)(Poston, Brandon)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lake Russell Lending LLC, Lake Russell Holdings LLC. Ryan R Faulkenberry served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Ryan Faulkenberry)(Poston, Brandon)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lake Russell Lending LLC, Lake Russell Holdings LLC. Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Evergreen Resources)(Poston, Brandon)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc, Ryan R Faulkenberry, William R Faulkenberry. (sfla) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/29/2019) (alew, ). Modified on 8/29/2019 to replace with corrected document per attorney request (alew, ).
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Lake Russell Holdings LLC, Lake Russell Lending LLC. (Attachments: #1 Citizenship of Members of Plaintiffs)(sfla)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lake Russell Holdings LLC, Lake Russell Lending LLC.(sfla)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc, Ryan R Faulkenberry, William R Faulkenberry ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8636109) filed by Lake Russell Lending LLC, Lake Russell Holdings LLC. Service due by 11/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Operating Agreement, #2 Exhibit B, part 1 - Subdivision Declarations, #3 Exhibit B, part 2 - Subdivision Declarations, #4 Exhibit C - Modification Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - 2-6-17 Default Notice, #6 Exhibit E - Settlement Agreement, #7 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Dissolution, #8 Exhibit G - 10-18-17 Default Notice, #9 Exhibit H - Second Settlement Agreement)(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake Russell Holdings LLC et al v. Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Russell Holdings LLC
Represented By: Brandon Keith Poston
Represented By: Graham Smith Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Russell Lending LLC
Represented By: Brandon Keith Poston
Represented By: Graham Smith Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan R Faulkenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R Faulkenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?