WB Music Corp et al v. Pig BBQ LLC, The et al
Plaintiff: WB Music Corp, Almo Music Corporation and Ray Vaughan Music Inc
Defendant: Jon Elsberry and Pig BBQ LLC, The
Case Number: 8:2019cv03544
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to The Pig BBQ, LLC, and Jon Elsberry by Almo Music Corporation, Ray Vaughan Music Inc, WB Music Corp. Response to Motion due by 2/20/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Douglas Jone, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ed Starke, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jeff Clark, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Wallace Lightsey, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Lightsey, Wallace)
January 23, 2020 Filing 15 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 10,11,12 Reason: attorney refiled to make correction. Corrected Filing Document Number #13 (alew, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jon Elsberry, Pig BBQ LLC, The (alew, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT byAlmo Music Corporation, Ray Vaughan Music Inc, WB Music Corp. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lightsey, Wallace)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER from Case Number 8:19-cv-03544-BHH to 8:19-cv-03544-DCC. (abuc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WB Music Corp, Almo Music Corporation, Ray Vaughan Music Inc. Jon Elsberry served on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020; Pig BBQ LLC, The served on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service of Summons, Complaint, Plaintiff's Responses to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright on The Pig BBQ, L.L.C., #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service of Summons, Complaint, Plaintiff's Responses to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright on Jon Elsberry)(Lightsey, Wallace)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (alew, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jon Elsberry, Pig BBQ LLC, The. (alew, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Almo Music Corporation, Ray Vaughan Music Inc, WB Music Corp.(alew, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jon Elsberry, Pig BBQ LLC, The ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8840728.), filed by WB Music Corp, Almo Music Corporation, Ray Vaughan Music Inc. Service due by 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Registration Schedule)(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WB Music Corp et al v. Pig BBQ LLC, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB Music Corp
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Almo Music Corporation
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Vaughan Music Inc
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Elsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pig BBQ LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?