Andrews v. South Department of Corrections
Petitioner: Damio B Andrews
Respondent: South Department of Corrections
Case Number: 8:2020cv02633
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 11 Case Transferred Out to Another District, #10 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Damio B Andrews 24703-171 BUTNER II FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 1500 BUTNER, NC 27509 (rweb, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopts #5 Report and Recommendation. This case be transferred to the United States DistrictCourt for the Eastern District of North Carolina. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 08/13/20. (rweb, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY by Damio B Andrews to #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Damio B Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rweb, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Damio B Andrews 24703-171 BUTNER II FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 1500 BUTNER, NC 27509 (rweb, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION it is recommended that the 2241 Petition filed in this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina. Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 07/27/2020. (rweb, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. Inmate is located at Butner, NC. (kric, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Damio B Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Emergency 2241 motion, #2 Detainer Action Documents, #3 Metformin Tablets information, #4 Inmate Requests to Staff, #5 DOJ Letter, #6 SCDC letters, #7 cover letter, #8 Envelope)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. South Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: South Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damio B Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?