Beniquez v. CCHM et al
Plaintiff: Ezer Muniz Beniquez
Defendant: M-H Middleton, M-H T Richards, M-H Brittany and CCHM
Case Number: 8:2020cv02648
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Ezer Muniz Beniquez. Response to Motion due by 9/22/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin. (rweb, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #13 Proper Form Order. IFP Form, Summons, four USM Forms and Complaint forms placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Ezer Muniz Beniquez 1595809 Charleston Detention Center 3841 Leeds Ave N. Charleston, SC 29405 (rweb, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 9/14/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 08/24/20. (rweb, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 08/24/20.(rweb, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time by Ezer Muniz Beniquez. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) No proposed order. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin. (rweb, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Proper Form Order, AO 240, Summons, USM 285 (4), complaint on court form placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Ezer Muniz Beniquez 1595809 Charleston Detention Center 3841 Leeds Ave N. Charleston, SC 2940 (rweb, )
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 07/23/2020. (rweb, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Charleston. (abuc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Ezer Muniz Beniquez. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(abuc) Modified on 7/20/2020 Document received as is from Charleston Clerks Office, no page one. (rweb, ).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M-H Brittany, CCHM, M-H Middleton, T Richards, filed by Ezer Muniz Beniquez. Service due by 10/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(abuc) Modified on 7/20/2020 documents received from Charleston Clerks Office, no signature page (rweb, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2020: #2 Complain on Court Form, #3 Envelope) (rweb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beniquez v. CCHM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-H Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-H T Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-H Brittany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCHM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezer Muniz Beniquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?