Justice et al v. AB Beverage Company Inc
Plaintiff: David Justice and Malissa Justice
Defendant: AB Beverage Company Inc
Case Number: 8:2020cv02885
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by AB Beverage Company Inc.(Braithwaite, Taylor)
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 15 Reason: per attorney request. (alew, )
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Conference. Conference set for 10/13/2020 09:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/14/20. (alew, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/5/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/30/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/23/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/22/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/11/2021, Discovery due by 3/15/2021, Motion in Limine due by 5/12/2021, Motions due by 3/29/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/21/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/11/2021, Mediation Due by 4/12/2021. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/14/20. (alew, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AB Beverage Company Inc.(Braithwaite, Taylor) (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/8/2020: to replace with corrected document (case number/Judge's initials) as provided by filing user) (kmca).
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 8 Reason: attorney refiled to make correction. Corrected Filing Document Number #9 (alew, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Justice, Malissa Justice. AB Beverage Company Inc served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Whetstone, Charles) Modified on 8/31/2020 to correct service and answer date per document(alew, ).
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER. New case number is 8-20-cv-2885-DCC. Please make a note of this for all future filings as well as Judge's preferences. (kmca)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Judge Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge J Michelle Childs no longer assigned to the case. (suro)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The court directs the Clerk of Court to reassign the instant matter to the District of South Carolina, Anderson/Greenwood Division. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.01, D.S.C., civil cases must be assigned to that division of the district where any natural defendant resides or where a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred. See Local Rule 3.01(A)(1), D.S.C. The allegations in the Complaint (ECF No. 1) make clear that the proper division assignment in this case is the Anderson/Greenwood Division, where the alleged accident occurred that caused injury to Plaintiffs. (See id. at 2 6.) Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/11/2020. (asni, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Justice, Malissa Justice.(asni, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AB Beverage Company Inc. (asni, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AB Beverage Company Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9265973.), filed by David Justice, Malissa Justice. Service due by 11/5/2020(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justice et al v. AB Beverage Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AB Beverage Company Inc
Represented By: Robin Anderson Braithwaite
Represented By: Taylor Scott Braithwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Justice
Represented By: Charles William Whetstone, III
Represented By: Charles W Whetstone, Jr
Represented By: Cheryl F Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malissa Justice
Represented By: Charles William Whetstone, III
Represented By: Charles W Whetstone, Jr
Represented By: Cheryl F Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?