Estling v. GIDB Tiki LLC
Plaintiff: David Estling
Defendant: GIDB Tiki LLC doing business as Tiki Hut
Case Number: 8:2020cv03204
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Order, Set Deadlines placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to GIDB Tiki, LLC d/b/a Tiki Hut c/o Craig Kinley, Registered Agent 2407 West North Avenue Anderson, SC 29625 (abuc)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Defendant is ordered to obtain counsel no later than 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/6/2020. (abuc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to GIDB Tiki LLC (abuc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT with Declaration byDavid Estling. (Murphy, Brian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT regarding documents delivered to office of counsel for Plaintiff by David Estling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents delivered to office with envelope)(Murphy, Brian)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Estling. GIDB Tiki LLC served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents PS Form 3811 - GIDB Tiki, LLC d/b/a "Tiki Hut")(Murphy, Brian)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GIDB Tiki LLC. (abuc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Estling.(abuc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GIDB Tiki LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9326983.), filed by David Estling. Service due by 12/7/2020(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estling v. GIDB Tiki LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Estling
Represented By: Brian P Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIDB Tiki LLC doing business as Tiki Hut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?