Phillips v. Stirling et al
Plaintiff: Justin M. Phillips
Defendant: Cynthia Petty, Annie McCullough, Jamal R. Clavon, Kenneth Lloyd, Michael McCall, Gloria J. Cooper, Jason K. Jackson, Joseph Stines, Edward Tisdale Jr., Aaron Joyner, Dennis Patterson and Bryan P. Stirling
Case Number: 8:2021cv00407
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aaron Joyner.(Ganes, Elloree)
April 9, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aaron Joyner.(Ganes, Elloree)
April 7, 2021 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jamal R. Clavon, Gloria J. Cooper, Jason K. Jackson, Kenneth Lloyd.(Riddle, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jamal R. Clavon, Gloria J. Cooper, Jason K. Jackson, Kenneth Lloyd, (Riddle, Jonathan) (Main Document 18 replaced provided by filing user on 4/7/2021) (sgri)
April 5, 2021 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Annie McCullough, Edward Tisdale Jr., Cynthia Petty (Plyler, Daniel) (Main Document 17 replaced provided by filing user on 4/7/2021)
April 5, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Annie McCullough, Edward Tisdale Jr., Cynthia Petty(Plyler, Daniel) (Main Document 16 replaced provided by filing user on 4/7/2021) (sgri).
April 3, 2021 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bryan P. Stirling.(Holmes, Janet)
April 3, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bryan P. Stirling.(Holmes, Janet)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/22/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/6/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 5/6/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/27/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/28/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/28/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/28/2021, Discovery due by 9/27/2021, Motions due by 11/29/2021, Mediation Due by 10/27/2021, This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 9 of this Order, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 4/1/2021. (sgri)
March 31, 2021 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael McCall.(Thomas, Lisa)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Michael McCall.(Thomas, Lisa)
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dennis Patterson, Joseph Stines.(Arthur, Samuel)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dennis Patterson, Joseph Stines.(Arthur, Samuel)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel F Arthur, III on behalf of Dennis Patterson, Joseph Stines (Arthur, Samuel)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin M. Phillips. Jamal R. Clavon served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021; Gloria J. Cooper served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021; Jason K. Jackson served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021; Aaron Joyner served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021; Kenneth Lloyd served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021; Annie McCullough served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021; Dennis Patterson served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021; Cynthia Petty served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021; Joseph Stines served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021; Bryan P. Stirling served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021; Edward Tisdale Jr. served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PoS McCullough, #2 Exhibit PoS Petty, #3 Exhibit PoS Cooper, #4 Exhibit PoS Lloyd, #5 Exhibit PoS Stirling, #6 Exhibit PoS Patterson, #7 Exhibit PoS Stines, #8 Exhibit PoS Tisdale, #9 Exhibit PoS Clavon, #10 Exhibit PoS Jackson, #11 Exhibit PoS Joyner)(Elliott, Charles)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Justin M. Phillips. Michael McCall served on 2/20/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service McCall)(Elliott, Charles)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jamal R. Clavon, Gloria J. Cooper, Jason K. Jackson, Aaron Joyner, Kenneth Lloyd, Michael McCall, Annie McCullough, Dennis Patterson, Cynthia Petty, Joseph Stines, Bryan P. Stirling, Edward Tisdale Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons 1, #2 Summons 2, #3 Summons 3, #4 Summons 4, #5 Summons 5, #6 Summons 6, #7 Summons 7, #8 Summons 8, #9 Summons 9, #10 Summons 10, #11 Summons 11). (sgri)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Justin M. Phillips. (sgri)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jamal R. Clavon, Gloria J. Cooper, Jason K. Jackson, Aaron Joyner, Kenneth Lloyd, Michael McCall, Annie McCullough, Dennis Patterson, Cynthia Petty, Joseph Stines, Bryan P. Stirling, Edward Tisdale Jr. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9638202.) Filed by Justin M. Phillips. Service due by 5/11/2021 (sgri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Stirling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Petty
Represented By: Daniel C Plyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie McCullough
Represented By: Daniel C Plyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamal R. Clavon
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lloyd
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McCall
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria J. Cooper
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason K. Jackson
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Stines
Represented By: Samuel F Arthur, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Tisdale Jr.
Represented By: Daniel C Plyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Joyner
Represented By: Elloree A Ganes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Patterson
Represented By: Samuel F Arthur, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan P. Stirling
Represented By: Janet Brooks Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin M. Phillips
Represented By: Charles Carter Elliott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?