Hughes v. CVS Pharmacy Inc
Plaintiff: Judith N Hughes
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc doing business as CVS Pharmacy Store #7534
Case Number: 8:2021cv00672
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 24 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER #21 ADR Statement/Certification. Reason: re-filed by attorney to attach correct document. Corrected Filing Document Number #23 ADR Statement/Certification. Filed same date as original filing: 5/6/21. (kmca)
May 6, 2021 Filing 23 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Judith N Hughes(Frost, Gary)
May 6, 2021 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Judith N Hughes.(Frost, Gary)
April 28, 2021 Filing 19 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's ADR Statement due by 5/3/2021, Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.03 Answers due by 5/3/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/14/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/14/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/15/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/15/2021, Discovery due by 1/14/2022, Mediation Due by 2/14/2022, Motions due by 2/28/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 4/29/2022 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 4/28/21. (kmca)
April 27, 2021 Filing 18 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by CVS Pharmacy Inc(Clement, James)
April 27, 2021 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by CVS Pharmacy Inc.(Clement, James)
April 27, 2021 Filing 16 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by CVS Pharmacy Inc, Judith N Hughes.(Clement, James) (Main Document 16 replaced on 4/28/2021: to replace with corrected document (signature) as provided by filing user). Modified on 4/28/21: to add joint filer as listed (kmca).
April 27, 2021 Filing 15 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by CVS Pharmacy Inc, Judith N Hughes.(Clement, James) Modified on 4/28/2021: to add joint filer as listed (kmca).
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 9/20/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/29/21. (kmca)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/19/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/3/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 5/3/2021, ADR Statement/Certification due by 5/3/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/14/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/14/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/13/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/13/2021, Discovery due by 9/13/2021, Motions due by 9/27/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 11/29/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/29/21. (kmca)
March 26, 2021 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Judith N Hughes.(Frost, Gary)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #5 Notice of Removal Letter/Association of Counsel, to Gary T Frost: gfrost@allandfrost.com. (kmca)
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by CVS Pharmacy Inc.(Clement, James)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Notice of Removal Letter, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Gary T. Frost, All & Frost LLC, Post Office Box 731, Union, SC 29379. (kmca)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Removal to Plaintiff's attorney Gary T. Frost. (kmca)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CVS Pharmacy Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories. (kmca)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CVS Pharmacy Inc.(kmca)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pickens County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-39-01157. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9695404), filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. CVS Pharmacy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc doing business as CVS Pharmacy Store #7534
Represented By: Molly Hood Craig
Represented By: James Whittington Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith N Hughes
Represented By: Gary T Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?