Nesbit, Jr. v. Stirling et al
Plaintiff: Henry Nesbit, Jr.
Defendant: Sam Ray, Kenneth Sharp, Mark Bethea, Arenda Thomas, Quanda Abrams, Colie L. Rushton, Edward Tisdale, Jr., Mark Hatton, Brian P. Stirling, Nicholas Marquez, Michael McCall, James Holden, Joseph Stines, Aaron Joyner, Yolanda Gayle Holmes, Dennis Patterson, William Burley, III, Marquita McCullough, Raymond Johnson, Lucretia Mack, Cynthia Petty, Annie McCullough, Romona Poston, Edwin Settles, Linda Haynesworth, Jamal Yates, Marilyn Williams, Emily Anderson, Sequawna Rogers, Michael Beedy, Joel Anderson, Jacobia Richardson, Venyke Smith, Elsie Pressley, Colona Robinson, Jamal Clavon, Niccole Sheppard and Bryan P. Stirling
Case Number: 8:2021cv00960
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
2 Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION LEE PRISON RIOT CASES: The Court hereby appoints the Honorable Tommy Russo as the mediator in all of the Lee Prison Riot cases. The parties are directed to initiate contact with Judge Russo to schedule mediation in accordance with the dates outlined in the Court's Scheduling Order for mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 5/19/2021. (sgri)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING RULE 16 CONFERENCE CONSIDERATIONS: A written report shall be jointly provided by the parties in each matter outlining the issues identified above at least ten (10) days after the Rule 26(f) report is filed with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 5/19/2021. (sgri)
May 18, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Henry Nesbit, Jr. as to Defendant Bryan P. Stirling (Guerry, John)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER extending Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) conference and report deadlines. A conference of the parties pursuant to Rule 26(f) shall be held no later than 14 days after the date the last Answer has been filed. At the conference, the parties shall confer concerning all matters set forth in Rule 26(f) and whether the schedule set forth in the Courts previously entered Conference and Scheduling Order is appropriate and, if not, what modifications are necessary. Additionally, the parties shall file a Rule 26(f) report and shall make the required initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) no later than 14 days after the Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 5/18/2021. (sgri)
May 17, 2021 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aaron Joyner.(Ganes, Elloree)
May 17, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint,, by Aaron Joyner.(Ganes, Elloree)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/24/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/7/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 6/7/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/28/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/28/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/27/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/27/2021, Discovery due by 10/26/2021, Motions due by 12/29/2021, Mediation Due by 11/29/2021, This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 9 of this Order, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 5/3/2021. (sgri)
April 30, 2021 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael McCall.(Thomas, Lisa)
April 30, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint,, by Michael McCall.(Thomas, Lisa)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Honorable Sherri A Lydon. Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis no longer assigned to the case. (bshr, )
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Emily Anderson, Joel Anderson, Michael Beedy, Jamal Clavon, Linda Haynesworth, Raymond Johnson, Aaron Joyner, Lucretia Mack, Michael McCall, Annie McCullough, Marquita McCullough, Dennis Patterson, Cynthia Petty(Lieutenant), Romona Poston, Elsie Pressley, Sam Ray, Jacobia Richardson, Colona Robinson, Sequawna Rogers, Colie L. Rushton, Edwin Settles, Kenneth Sharp, Niccole Sheppard, Venyke Smith, Joseph Stines, Bryan P. Stirling, Arenda Thomas, Edward Tisdale, Jr., Marilyn Williams, Jamal Yates. (sgri)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aaron Joyner, Michael McCall, Dennis Patterson, Sam Ray, Colie L. Rushton, Kenneth Sharp, Joseph Stines, Brian P. Stirling, Arenda Thomas, Edward Tisdale, Jr., cynthia petty, Joel Anderson, Annie McCullough, Michael Beedy, Raymond Johnson, Venyke Smith, Marilyn Williams, Elsie Pressley, Niccole Sheppard, Jacobia Richardson, Romona Poston, Sequawna Rogers, Colonda Robinson, Emily Anderson, Lucretia Mack, Jamal Yates, Marquita McCullough, Jamal Clavon, Edwin Settles, Linda Haynesworth, filed by Henry Nesbit, Jr.. Service due by 7/6/2021 (Guerry, John) (Main Document 6 replaced as provided by filing user on 4/6/2021) (sgri).
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Quanda Abrams, Mark Bethea, William Burley, III, Mark Hatton, James Holden, Yolanda Gayle Holmes, Aaron Joyner, Nicholas Marquez, Michael McCall, Dennis Patterson, Sam Ray, Colie L. Rushton, Kenneth Sharp, Joseph Stines, Brian P. Stirling, Arenda Thomas, Edward Tisdale, Jr. (sgri)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Henry Nesbit, Jr. (sgri)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: COLUMBIA. (sgri)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quanda Abrams, Mark Bethea, William Burley, III, Mark Hatton, James Holden, Yolanda Gayle Holmes, Aaron Joyner, Nicholas Marquez, Michael McCall, Dennis Patterson, Sam Ray, Colie L. Rushton, Kenneth Sharp, Joseph Stines, Brian P. Stirling, Arenda Thomas, Edward Tisdale, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9747811.), filed by Henry Nesbit, Jr. Service due by 6/30/2021 (sgri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nesbit, Jr. v. Stirling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bethea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arenda Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanda Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colie L. Rushton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Tisdale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hatton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian P. Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McCall
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Stines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Joyner
Represented By: Elloree A Ganes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Gayle Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Burley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquita McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucretia Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romona Poston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Settles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Haynesworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamal Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequawna Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Beedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobia Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venyke Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsie Pressley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colona Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamal Clavon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niccole Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan P. Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Nesbit, Jr.
Represented By: John Horton Guerry
Represented By: Jerry Nicholas Theos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?