Ward v. Inn at Seneca Aid Opco LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles Ward
Defendant: Assisted Living Concepts LLC doing business as Keowee Place Assisted Living Community and Inn at Seneca Aid Opco LLC doing business as Keowee Place
Case Number: 8:2021cv01055
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 13 Order on Motion to Remand, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Melissa C. Burton, Oconee County Clerk of Court, PO Box 678, Walhalla, SC 29691-0678. (kmca)
May 14, 2021 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED 13 Order on Motion to Remand, to Oconee County Clerk of Court, Melissa C. Burton, lburton@oconeesc.com. (kmca)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion to Remand; finding as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 5/14/21.***Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court.*** (kmca)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Remand by Assisted Living Concepts LLC, Inn at Seneca Aid Opco LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/28/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Smyth, Todd)
May 5, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER. Jurisdiction in this matter is predicated upon diversity of citizenship pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. Within ten (10) days of the date of this order, Defendants Inn at Seneca Aid Opco LLC and Assisted Living Concepts LLC are to inform the court of the citizenship of all members for the purpose of determining whether the requirements of federal subject matter jurisdiction are satisfied. See 28 U.S.C. 1332; Gen. Tech. Applications, Inc. v. Exro Ltda, 388 F. 3d 114, 121 (4th Cir. 2004) (holding that "[a limited liability company] is an unincorporated association, akin to a partnership for diversity purposes, whose citizenship is that of its members."). Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 5/5/21. (kmca)
April 30, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Compel Response filed by Assisted Living Concepts LLC, Inn at Seneca Aid Opco LLC. (Smyth, Todd)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Compel Arbitration Response filed by Charles Ward.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/30/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Residency Agreement, #2 Exhibit DPOA)(Feidler, Stefan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charles Ward.(Feidler, Stefan)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Assisted Living Concepts LLC, Inn at Seneca Aid Opco LLC. (Response to Motion due by 4/23/2021) (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Residency Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Durable Power of Attorney)No proposed order.(kmca)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Assisted Living Concepts LLC, Inn at Seneca Aid Opco LLC.(kmca)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-37-00186. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9765760), filed by Inn at Seneca Aid Opco LLC, Assisted Living Concepts LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Inn at Seneca Aid Opco LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assisted Living Concepts LLC doing business as Keowee Place Assisted Living Community
Represented By: Kevin Richard Horton
Represented By: Todd W Smyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inn at Seneca Aid Opco LLC doing business as Keowee Place
Represented By: Kevin Richard Horton
Represented By: Todd W Smyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ward
Represented By: Stefan B Feidler
Represented By: Eric Poulin
Represented By: Roy T Willey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?