Mishoe v. Sterling et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Mishoe and Daniel Benedict Mishoe
Defendant: SCDC Director Bryan Sterling, Mr. Cohen, Dr. John Aldear, Casandra Means, Mr. Cohen Levern, Lt. Michael Lang, K. Hawley, Sgt. E. Smith, Terry Marshal and April Clark
Case Number: 8:2021cv03132
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by John Aldear, April Clark, K. Hawley, Michael Lang, Cohen Levern, Terry Marshal, Casandra Means, E. Smith, Bryan Sterling.(Akers, Nathaniel)
November 17, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Edwin Akers on behalf of John Aldear, April Clark, K. Hawley, Michael Lang, Cohen Levern, Terry Marshal, Casandra Means, E. Smith, Bryan Sterling (Akers, Nathaniel)
November 17, 2021 Filing 20 Summons Returned Unexecuted (Restricted Access) by Daniel Benedict Mishoe as to E. Smith. (sgri)
November 17, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Benedict Mishoe. John Aldear served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; April Clark served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; K. Hawley served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; Michael Lang served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; Cohen Levern served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; Terry Marshal served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; Casandra Means served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; Bryan Sterling served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (sgri)
November 1, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel Benedict Mishoe (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sgri)
October 21, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to John Aldear, April Clark, K. Hawley, Michael Lang, Cohen Levern, Terry Marshal, Casandra Means, E. Smith, Bryan Sterling. Service due by 1/19/2022 (sgri)
October 21, 2021 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Order 1983, 14 TEXT Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Daniel Benedict Mishoe Manning Correctional Institute Ward 7-C Bed #9 502 Beckman Road Columbia, SC 29202 (sgri)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 10/21/2021. (sgri)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER authorizing service of process and collection of filing fee. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350. Apprising the defendants of deadline for filing dispositive motions and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 10/21/2021. (sgri)
October 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE regarding summons filed by Daniel Benedict Mishoe (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sgri)
October 20, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Daniel Benedict Mishoe. Response to Motion due by 11/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) No proposed order. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D. Austin. (sgri)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #7 Proper Form Order, AO 440, AO 240, and 9x USM-285 forms placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Daniel Benedict Mishoe Manning Correctional Institute Ward 7-C Bed #9 502 Beckman Road Columbia, SC 29202 (sgri)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 10/20/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 9/29/2021. (sgri)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: COLUMBIA. (sgri)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Aldear, Cohen, Casandra Means, Bryan Sterling, filed by Daniel Mishoe. Service due by 12/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope) (sgri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mishoe v. Sterling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Mishoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Benedict Mishoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCDC Director Bryan Sterling
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr
Represented By: Nathaniel Edwin Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Aldear
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr
Represented By: Nathaniel Edwin Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casandra Means
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr
Represented By: Nathaniel Edwin Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cohen Levern
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr
Represented By: Nathaniel Edwin Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Michael Lang
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr
Represented By: Nathaniel Edwin Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Hawley
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr
Represented By: Nathaniel Edwin Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. E. Smith
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr
Represented By: Nathaniel Edwin Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Marshal
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr
Represented By: Nathaniel Edwin Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Clark
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr
Represented By: Nathaniel Edwin Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?