Peregrina-Paez v. Warden of Bennettsville Federal Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Jose Peregrina-Paez
Respondent: United States of America and Warden of Bennettsville Federal Correctional Institution
Case Number: 8:2021cv03393
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Amended Judgment placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jose Peregrina-Paez 15504 BENNETTSVILLE FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 52020 BENNETTSVILLE, SC 29512 (sgri)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED JUDGMENT Action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41. United States of America terminated on 10/19/2021. (sgri)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #10 Order Dismissing Case, #11 Judgment placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jose Peregrina-Paez 15504 BENNETTSVILLE FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 52020 BENNETTSVILLE, SC 29512 (sgri)
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 JUDGMENT Action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41. (sgri)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER the case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on 11/22/2021. (sgri)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #5 Proper Form Order and AO 240 placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jose Peregrina-Paez 15504 BENNETTSVILLE FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 52020 BENNETTSVILLE, SC 29512 (sgri)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 11/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 10/19/2021. (sgri)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: FLORENCE. (sgri)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jose Peregrina-Paez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sgri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peregrina-Paez v. Warden of Bennettsville Federal Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Peregrina-Paez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Bennettsville Federal Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?