Williams v. Carter et al
Plaintiff: Davonta Williams
Defendant: Taia Carter, Miles Perkins and Christian Riley
Case Number: 8:2021cv03491
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 17 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Davonta Williams 379115 Lee Correctional Institution 990 Wisacky Highway Bishopville, SC 29010 (sgri)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 motion for extension of time. Dispositive motions are due by March 15, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 12/21/2021. (sgri)
December 20, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by Taia Carter, Miles Perkins, Christian Riley. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Thomas, Lisa)
December 7, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Davonta Williams. Taia Carter served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021; Miles Perkins served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021; Christian Riley served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. (sgri)
December 2, 2021 Filing 13 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint of the Plaintiff by Taia Carter, Miles Perkins, Christian Riley.(Thomas, Lisa)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Taia Carter, Miles Perkins, Christian Riley. Service due by 1/25/2022 (sgri)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 9 TEXT Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Davonta Williams #379115 Lee Correctional Institution 990 Wisacky Highway Bishopville, SC 29010 (sgri)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 10/27/2021. (sgri)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Order 1983, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Davonta Williams #379115 Lee Correctional Institution 990 Wisacky Highway Bishopville, SC 29010 (sgri)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER authorizing service of process and collection of filing fee. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350. Apprising the defendants of deadline for filing dispositive motions and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 10/27/2021. (sgri)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: COLUMBIA. (sgri)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Davonta Williams. Response to Motion due by 11/8/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D. Austin. (sgri)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Taia Carter, Miles Perkins, Christian Riley, filed by Davonta Williams. Service due by 1/24/2022 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sgri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davonta Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taia Carter
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles Perkins
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Riley
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?