Bey v. Fekete
Plaintiff: Malcolm Bey
Defendant: Isaac K Fekete doing business as South Carolina Highway Patrol
Case Number: 8:2023cv04782
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2023 Filing 26 Letter from Malcolm Bey "Proposed settlement amount". (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(rweb, )
October 20, 2023 Filing 25 ASSEMBLED INITIAL ELECTRONIC RECORD TRANSMITTED TO FOURTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #19 Notice of Appeal. Electronic record successfully transmitted. (pbri, )
October 20, 2023 Filing 24 USCA Case Number 23-7047 for #19 Notice of Appeal, filed by Malcolm Bey. (pbri, )
October 17, 2023 Filing 22 ***DOCUMENT RE-MAILED #20 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Malcolm Bey, 918 Firetower Rd, Williamston, SC 29697. (rweb, )
October 17, 2023 Filing 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #20 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA, #19 Notice of Appeal and public docket sheet placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Malcolm Bey, 918 Firetower Rd, Williamston, SC 29697. (rweb, )
October 16, 2023 Filing 20 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re #19 Notice of Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (rweb, ) (Main Document 20 replaced on 10/17/2023) (rweb, ). Modified on 10/17/2023 to correct file date (rweb, ).
October 16, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 16 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation, by Malcolm Bey. - The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(rweb, )
October 11, 2023 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 16 Text Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Malcolm Bey 918 Firetower Rd Williamston, SC 29697. (arut)
October 11, 2023 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: In light of the amended and second amended complaints filed by the plaintiff, the Court declines to adopt the Report and Recommendation at this time and remands this matter to the Magistrate Judge for further consideration in light of the more detailed allegations submitted by the plaintiff. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/11/23. (sfla) Modified on 10/11/2023 to edit text (arut).
October 10, 2023 Filing 14 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Isaac K Fekete, filed by Malcolm Bey. Service due by 1/8/2024.(arut)
October 6, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Isaac K Fekete, filed by Malcolm Bey. Service due by 1/4/2024. (rweb, )
September 28, 2023 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 9 Text Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 Order, #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Malcolm Bey, 11 Transfer of Case Management, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Malcolm Bey, 918 Firetower Rd, Williamston, SC 29697. (rweb, )
September 28, 2023 Filing 11 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Henry M Herlong, Jr. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 250 East North Street, Greenville, SC 29601. Please make note of your new case number: 8:23-cv-04782-HMH. (rweb, )
September 28, 2023 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION It is recommended that the District Court dismiss this action. Objections to R&R due by 10/12/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/28/23. (rweb, )
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/28/23.(rweb, )
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/28/23. (rweb, )
September 25, 2023 Filing 5 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Anderson/Greenwood. (rweb, )
September 25, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Malcolm Bey. Response to Motion due by 10/10/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin. (rweb, )
September 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Isaac K Fekete, filed by Malcolm Bey. Service due by 12/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(rweb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Fekete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac K Fekete doing business as South Carolina Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?