Gates v. Edgefield F.C.I.
Petitioner: Brendon J Gates
Respondent: Warden of Edgefield Federal Correctional Institution
Case Number: 8:2024cv07661
Filed: December 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2025 Filing 20 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #13 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, 18 Document Mailed, served on James R. McHenry III, Acting Attorney General on 2/6/25. (rweb, )
January 29, 2025 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED CERTIFIED (9589 0710 5270 0422 1042 46) #13 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to James R. McHenry III, Acting Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Room B-103, Washington, DC 20530-0001. (rweb, )
January 29, 2025 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 15 Text Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 14 Text Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #13 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Brendon J Gates placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Brendon J Gates #72535019, EDGEFIELD FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 725, EDGEFIELD, SC 29824. (rweb, )
January 29, 2025 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is recommended that the Petition be DISMISSED without prejudice and without requiring Respondent to file an answer or return. Objections to R&R due by 2/12/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge William S. Brown on 1/29/25. (rweb, )
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge William S. Brown on 1/29/25.(rweb, )
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge William S. Brown on 1/29/25.(rweb, )
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge William S. Brown on 1/29/25. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(rweb, )
January 27, 2025 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Brendon J Gates. Response to Motion due by 2/10/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to William S. Brown.(rweb, )
January 6, 2025 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Proper Form Order, IFP, blank petition and public docket sheet placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Brendon J Gates #72535019, EDGEFIELD FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 725, EDGEFIELD, SC 29824. (rweb, )
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER. Case to be brought into proper form by 1/27/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge William S. Brown on 1/6/25. (rweb, )
January 2, 2025 Filing 5 Letter from Brendon Gates re: concerns about mail received and requesting docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(agig)
December 26, 2024 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Anderson/Greenwood. (rweb, )
December 26, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Brendon J Gates. Response to Motion due by 1/9/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to William S. Brown.(rweb, )
December 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edgefield F.C.I., filed by Brendon J Gates. Service due by 3/26/2025. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rweb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gates v. Edgefield F.C.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brendon J Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Edgefield Federal Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?