Tant et al v. Blue World Pools Inc
Plaintiff: Peggy Tant and Eugene Tant
Defendant: Blue World Pools Inc
Case Number: 9:2011cv01102
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Beaufort Office
County: Hampton
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER dismissing the action without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/10/2012. (bshr, )
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER directing plaintiffs to inform the court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order if they intend to pursue arbitration or not. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 08/31/2012. (bshr, )
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Stay; granting 7 Motion to Compel Arbitration; finding as moot 7 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 06/22/2011.(bshr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tant et al v. Blue World Pools Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Tant
Represented By: Glenn Walters
Represented By: Paul W Owen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Tant
Represented By: Paul W Owen, Jr
Represented By: Glenn Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue World Pools Inc
Represented By: Michael McNulty Beal
Represented By: Paul D Harrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?