Craft v. South Carolina State Plastering LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline L Craft
Defendant: South Carolina State Plastering LLC, Peter Conley, Del Webb Communities Inc and Pulte Homes Inc
Case Number: 9:2015cv05080
Filed: December 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Beaufort Office
County: Beaufort
Presiding Judge: Sol Blatt
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying 89 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on April 26, 2018.(jmcg, )
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 61 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on May 30, 2017.(jmcg, )
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 57 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on February 27, 2017.(jmcg, )
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 40 Motion to Quash. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on January 12, 2017.(jmcg, )
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER deferring ruling on 40 Motion to Quash; granting 42 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on December 27, 2016.(jmcg, )
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 32 Motion to Quash without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on November 4, 2016.(jmcg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craft v. South Carolina State Plastering LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline L Craft
Represented By: John T Chakeris
Represented By: William Jefferson Leath, Jr
Represented By: Michael S Seekings
Represented By: Phillip W Segui, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina State Plastering LLC
Represented By: Everett Augustus Kendall, II
Represented By: Christy E Mahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Conley
Represented By: Everett Augustus Kendall, II
Represented By: Christy E Mahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Webb Communities Inc
Represented By: Henry Wilkins Frampton, IV
Represented By: Celeste Tiller Jones
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulte Homes Inc
Represented By: Henry Wilkins Frampton, IV
Represented By: Celeste Tiller Jones
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?