Gault v. Thacher et al

Plaintiff: Ashley Shane Gault
Defendant: Jane Vaden Thacher and Vaden of Beaufort Inc
Case Number: 9:2018cv03157
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion by Peter D. Muller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 1/15/2019.(jbry, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter D. Muller ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8206918) by Jane Vaden Thacher, Vaden of Beaufort Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Flynn, William) (Main Document 18 replaced on 1/14/2019) (jbry, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2019: #2 pro hac vice application, #3 certificate of good standing) (jbry, ). Modified on 1/14/2019 to remove attachments from main document(jbry, ).
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Jane Vaden Thacher, Vaden of Beaufort Inc. (Flynn, William)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by Jane Vaden Thacher. (Flynn, William)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Jane Vaden Thacher, Vaden of Beaufort Inc. (Flynn, William)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by William James Flynn on behalf of Jane Vaden Thacher, Vaden of Beaufort Inc (Flynn, William)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 MOTION to Stay , #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for Monday, 2/4/2019 at 1:30 PM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (jbry, )
December 8, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Ashley Shane Gault.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/17/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Request for Production to Defendants)(Martin, Bradford)
December 8, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by Ashley Shane Gault.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/17/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ashley Shane Gault)(Martin, Bradford)
December 8, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Ashley Shane Gault.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/17/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Proposed Amended Shareholder Agreement, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Ashley Shane Gault)(Martin, Bradford)
December 8, 2018 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ashley Shane Gault.(Martin, Bradford)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay by Jane Vaden Thacher, Vaden of Beaufort Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/10/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Harvey, William)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jane Vaden Thacher, Vaden of Beaufort Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/10/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)No proposed order.(Harvey, William)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Jane Vaden Thacher by Jane Vaden Thacher, Vaden of Beaufort Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stock Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Shareholders Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Promissory Note)(Harvey, William) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/27/2018) (jbry, ). Modified on 11/27/2018 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user and to add descriptions to exhibits (jbry, ).
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Jane Vaden Thacher, Vaden of Beaufort Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/10/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Shareholder Agreement) No proposed order.(Harvey, William) Modified on 11/26/2018 to add description to exhibit (jbry, ).
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Jane Vaden Thacher, Vaden of Beaufort Inc(Harvey, William)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jane Vaden Thacher, Vaden of Beaufort Inc.(jbry, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-07-02066. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8120698), filed by Vaden of Beaufort Inc, Jane Vaden Thacher. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice of Removal to State Court)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gault v. Thacher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Vaden Thacher
Represented By: William B Harvey, III
Represented By: Peter Deppish Muller
Represented By: William James Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaden of Beaufort Inc
Represented By: William B Harvey, III
Represented By: Peter Deppish Muller
Represented By: William James Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Shane Gault
Represented By: Bradford Neal Martin
Represented By: Laura WH Teer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?