Ray et al v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Chester A Ray, Jr and Mary S Ray
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections, Courtney A Dixon, Bernadette P Richardson, N Fox, Warden Cecilia Reynolds and Angela Heatherwood
Case Number: 9:2019cv00147
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/15/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/6/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 3/4/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/28/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/25/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/26/2019, Discovery due by 10/24/2019, Motions due by 12/23/2019, Mediation Due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 02/27/2019. (egra, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Courtney A Dixon, Angela Heatherwood, Cecilia Reynolds, Bernadette P Richardson, South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Settana, Daniel)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Courtney A Dixon, Angela Heatherwood, Cecilia Reynolds, Bernadette P Richardson, South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Settana, Daniel)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/18/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/4/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 3/4/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/25/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/25/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/24/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/24/2019, Discovery due by 7/24/2019, Motions due by 9/23/2019, Mediation Due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 01/28/2019. (egra, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Courtney A Dixon, Angela Heatherwood, Cecilia Reynolds, Bernadette P Richardson, South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Settana, Daniel) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/25/2019) (egra, ). Modified on 1/25/2019 Replaced to correct case division on document (egra, ).
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Courtney A Dixon, N Fox, Cecilia Reynolds, Bernadette P Richardson, South Carolina Department of Corrections. (egra, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-cp-31-0403. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8216591), filed by South Carolina Department of Corrections, N Fox, Bernadette P Richardson, Cecilia Reynolds, Courtney A Dixon. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray et al v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney A Dixon
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette P Richardson
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Fox
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Cecilia Reynolds
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Heatherwood
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester A Ray, Jr
Represented By: Victoria S H Knight
Represented By: Gabrielle Anna Sulpizio
Represented By: James Edward Bell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary S Ray
Represented By: Victoria S H Knight
Represented By: Gabrielle Anna Sulpizio
Represented By: James Edward Bell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?