Head v. Murry et al

Plaintiff: Alexander Head
Defendant: Ofc Gresham, Ofc. Murry, Sgt. Jackson and Lt. Mickey Bolland
Case Number: 9:2019cv00434
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Deficiency Memo placed in U.S. Mail to Alexander Head, Jr Kirkland Correctional Institution 4344 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210. (egra, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 2nd Deficiency Memo 8 Notice of Change of ADdress See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. Docket Correction due 4/8/2019. (egra, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Deficiency Memo placed in U.S. Mail to Alexander Head, Jr Kirkland Correctional Institution 4344 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210. (egra, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 Deficiency Memo 8 Notice of Change of Address. See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. Docket Correction due 3/25/2019. (egra, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alexander Head. Address updated in ECF this date. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (egra, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2019: #2 Signature Page, #3 Envelope) (egra, ).
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED Change of Address form placed in U.S. Mail to Alexander Head Greenwood County Detention Center 528 Edgefield Avenue Greenwood, SC 29646. (egra, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 Letter regarding possible change of address from Alexander Head. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (egra, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenwood. (egra, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Alexander Head. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mickey Bolland, Gresham, Jackson, Murry, filed by Alexander Head. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Head v. Murry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Mickey Bolland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?