Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Brody's Bar & Grill LLC et al

Plaintiff: Merjoda Music Inc, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Rice and Beans Music, Concord Music Group Inc, Velvet Apple Music, Welsh Witch Music, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Rondor Music International Inc, Tangerine Music Corp, House of Cash Inc, Interior Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Sony-ATV Songs LLC and EO Smith Music
Defendant: Todd C Morrison and Brody's Bar & Grill LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv00591
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Brody's Bar & Grill LLC and Todd C Morrison's answers are now due 5/22/2019. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/26/2019.(sshe, ) Modified docket text on 4/26/2019 (sshe, ).
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Broadcast Music Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, EO Smith Music, House of Cash Inc, Interior Music Corp, Merjoda Music Inc, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Rice and Beans Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Sony-ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Tangerine Music Corp, Velvet Apple Music, Welsh Witch Music. Response to Motion due by 5/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Ellis, Bernie)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rondor Music International Inc, Velvet Apple Music, Tangerine Music Corp, Interior Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Merjoda Music Inc, Rice and Beans Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Sony-ATV Songs LLC, Concord Music Group Inc, EO Smith Music, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Welsh Witch Music, House of Cash Inc. Brody's Bar & Grill LLC served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rondor Music International Inc, Velvet Apple Music, Tangerine Music Corp, Interior Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Merjoda Music Inc, Rice and Beans Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Sony-ATV Songs LLC, Concord Music Group Inc, EO Smith Music, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Welsh Witch Music, House of Cash Inc. Todd C Morrison served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #6 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to the US Copyright Office (sshe, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (sshe, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Broadcast Music Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, EO Smith Music, House of Cash Inc, Interior Music Corp, Merjoda Music Inc, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Rice and Beans Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Sony-ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Tangerine Music Corp, Velvet Apple Music, Welsh Witch Music.(sshe, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Broadcast Music Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, EO Smith Music, House of Cash Inc, Interior Music Corp, Merjoda Music Inc, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Rice and Beans Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Sony-ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Tangerine Music Corp, Velvet Apple Music, Welsh Witch Music.(sshe, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8294252.), filed by Rondor Music International Inc, Velvet Apple Music, Tangerine Music Corp, Interior Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Merjoda Music Inc, Rice and Beans Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Sony-ATV Songs LLC, Concord Music Group Inc, EO Smith Music, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Welsh Witch Music, House of Cash Inc. Service due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Songs)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Brody's Bar & Grill LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merjoda Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Diamond Music Corp
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rice and Beans Music
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velvet Apple Music
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsh Witch Music
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painted Desert Music Corporation
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tangerine Music Corp
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Cash Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interior Music Corp
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony-ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EO Smith Music
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd C Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brody's Bar & Grill LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?