Schmitigal et al v. Twohig et al
Plaintiff: Stanley Schmitigal and Marjorie Schmitigal
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Paul Twohig
Case Number: 9:2019cv01511
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by Ford Motor Company. (Sammataro, Carmelo)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Continue Scheduling Conference Response filed by Marjorie Schmitigal, Stanley Schmitigal.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/16/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Moore, Christopher)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by Marjorie Schmitigal, Stanley Schmitigal.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/16/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - certificate of authority, #2 Exhibit 2 - state court order in Harper, #3 Exhibit 3 - state court order in Oliver)(Moore, Christopher)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Paul Twohig.(Highfield, Duke)
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Paul Twohig.(Highfield, Duke)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ford Motor Company.(Sammataro, Carmelo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Continue Scheduling Conference by Ford Motor Company. Response to Motion due by 7/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Sammataro, Carmelo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ford Motor Company. Response to Motion due by 7/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Roger Burnett, #3 Exhibit B - Brown v. Ford, #4 Exhibit C - Aybar v. Ford, #5 Exhibit D - Green-McKenzie v. Ford, #6 Exhibit E - Kommer v. Ford)No proposed order.(Sammataro, Carmelo)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Marjorie Schmitigal. Paul Twohig served on 6/5/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service as to Defendant Twohig)(Moore, Christopher)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Paul Twohig answer due 7/5/2019. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/10/2019.(jbry, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Marjorie Schmitigal. as to Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proof of Service)(Moore, Christopher) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/11/2019) (jbry, ). Modified on 6/11/2019 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user(jbry, ).
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Paul Twohig. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Highfield, Duke)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company, Paul Twohig. (jbry, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Marjorie Schmitigal, Stanley Schmitigal.(jbry, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/24/2019) (jbry, ). Modified on 5/24/2019 to correct case number(jbry, ).
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, Paul Twohig ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8464145.), filed by Stanley Schmitigal, Marjorie Schmitigal. Service due by 8/22/2019(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmitigal et al v. Twohig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Schmitigal
Represented By: Dale Ernest Akins
Represented By: Christopher James Moore
Represented By: Terry Edward Richardson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Schmitigal
Represented By: Dale Ernest Akins
Represented By: Christopher James Moore
Represented By: Terry Edward Richardson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Carmelo B Sammataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Twohig
Represented By: William O Sweeny, IV
Represented By: Brandt Robert Horton
Represented By: Duke Raleigh Highfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?